PA HB746 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act limiting assignment of State-owned vehicles.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limiting assignment of State-owned vehicles.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 746 PN 731, FP (Y: 183 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 23 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - House - House Floor: HB 746 PN 731, 2021 A581, SCHLOSSBERG (Y: 90 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-03-17 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-21SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2022-04-12SenateIn the Senate
2022-04-12HouseThird consideration and final passage (183-16)
2022-04-11HouseRemoved from table
2022-04-11HouseLaid on the table
2021-12-14HouseRemoved from table
2021-12-14HouseLaid on the table
2021-09-28HouseRemoved from table
2021-09-28HouseLaid on the table
2021-06-09HouseRemoved from table
2021-06-09HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-05HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-03-24HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-03-24HouseSecond consideration
2021-03-23HouseRemoved from table
2021-03-17HouseLaid on the table
2021-03-17HouseFirst consideration
2021-03-17HouseReported as committed
2021-03-03HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=746
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0746&pn=0731
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0746P0731.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=155
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=110
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/05/2021&RollCallId=261
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=818

Bill Comments

feedback