PA HB507 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-16)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 6 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-05 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act providing for the regulation of home improvement contracts and for the registration of certain contractors; prohibiting certain acts; providing for penalties; establishing the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund; and providing for claims against the fund.
Title
An Act providing for the regulation of home improvement contracts and for the registration of certain contractors; prohibiting certain acts; providing for penalties; establishing the Home Improvement Guaranty Fund; and providing for claims against the fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-22 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-22 | First consideration | |
2007-05-22 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-06 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=507 |