PA HB47 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-07 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 71 (State Government) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in boards and offices, establishing the Department of Local Government and Community Affairs and transferring specific powers and duties from the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Department of State to the Department of Local Government and Community Affairs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In boards and offices, establishing the Department of Local Government and Community Affairs and transferring specific powers and duties from the Department of Community and Economic Development and the Department of State to the Department of Local Government and Community Affairs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Re-report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A00183 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-07HouseLaid on the table
2021-04-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as amended
2021-01-11HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=47
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0047&pn=0026
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0047&pn=0281
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/HA/Public/HaCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sYear=2021&sInd=0&body=H&type=B&bn=0047&pn=0026&aYear=2021&an=00183
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=46
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=47

Bill Comments

feedback