PA HB443 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-16)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-03 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Status: Introduced on March 13 2007 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-12-03 - Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
Summary
An Act requiring certain records of the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions, authorities and agencies and other public bodies to be open for examination, inspection and copying for denial or refusal of access under certain circumstances, for final agency determinations, for appeals, for court costs and attorney fees, for penalties and for immunity; establishing the Pennsylvania Public Records Office and providing for its powers and duties; and making a related repeal.
Title
An Act requiring certain records of the Commonwealth and its political subdivisions, authorities and agencies and other public bodies to be open for examination, inspection and copying for denial or refusal of access under certain circumstances, for final agency determinations, for appeals, for court costs and attorney fees, for penalties and for immunity; establishing the Pennsylvania Public Records Office and providing for its powers and duties; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-03 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-30 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-10-29 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-10-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-10-22 | Removed from table | |
2007-10-18 | Laid on the table | |
2007-10-18 | First consideration | |
2007-10-18 | Reported as amended | |
2007-03-13 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=443 |