PA HB441 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-11)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-25 - Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2007 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2007-06-25 - Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of unlawful capture and electronic transmission of identifying information.
Title
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for the offense of unlawful capture and electronic transmission of identifying information.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-06-25 | Referred to COMMUNICATIONS AND TECHNOLOGY | |
2007-06-18 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-13 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-06-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-06-04 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-05-24 | Removed from table | |
2007-05-22 | Laid on the table | |
2007-05-22 | First consideration | |
2007-05-22 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-26 | Referred to JUDICIARY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=441 |