PA HB43 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 68
Status: Enrolled on December 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 68
Summary
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for uniform environmental covenants.
Title
An Act amending Title 27 (Environmental Resources) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for uniform environmental covenants.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-12-18 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-12-13 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-12-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-12-12 | Signed in House | |
2007-12-12 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2007-12-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-12-03 | Referred to RULES | |
2007-11-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-11-19 | Amended on third consideration | |
2007-11-13 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-16 | First consideration | |
2007-10-16 | Reported as committed | |
2007-06-27 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2007-06-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-06-21 | Second consideration | |
2007-06-18 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-05-21 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-05-21 | Removed from table | |
2007-04-17 | Laid on the table | |
2007-04-17 | First consideration | |
2007-04-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-01-30 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=43 |