PA HB42 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-14 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 24 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-14 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for the establishment of the Historic Preservation Incentive Program for historic commercial and residential sites, for grants and for tax credits.
Title
Providing for the establishment of the Historic Preservation Incentive Program for historic commercial and residential sites, for grants and for tax credits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-24 - House - HB 42 PN 2038, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-14 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT | |
2009-06-24 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-24 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-23 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-08 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-02-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-05 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-04 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-04 | First consideration | |
2009-02-04 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-26 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |