PA HB408 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-19 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 16, 1992 (P.L.155, No.28), known as the Assessors Certification Act, further providing for nonapplicability.
Title
Further providing for nonapplicability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-28 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - House - HB 408 PN 418, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-11-18 - House - HB 408 PN 418, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-19 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-01-28 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-12-03 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-11-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-11-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2013-11-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-11-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-13 | House | Second consideration |
2013-11-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-09-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-17 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-17 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-29 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |