PA HB373 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 22-6)
Status: Passed on June 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-28 - Act No. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of February 1, 1966 (1965 P.L.1656, No.581), known as The Borough Code, further providing for general powers.
Title
Further providing for general powers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-20 - Senate - HB 373 PN 338, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 373 PN 338, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2011-06-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - HB 373 PN 338, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-28 | Senate | Act No. 12 |
2011-06-28 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2011-06-22 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2011-06-21 | Senate | Signed in House |
2011-06-20 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2011-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2011-06-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2011-05-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-05-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2011-05-10 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2011-03-11 | Senate | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2011-03-07 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-03-07 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2011-03-07 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-03-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-03-01 | House | Second consideration |
2011-02-16 | House | Removed from table |
2011-02-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-02-15 | House | First consideration |
2011-02-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-02-01 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |