PA HB291 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-07-03 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for definitions, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages alternating brewers' licenses, for distributors' and importing distributors' restrictions on sales, storage, etc., and for breweries.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for malt and brewed beverages manufacturers', distributors' and importing distributors' licenses, for malt and brewed beverages alternating brewers' licenses, for distributors' and importing distributors' restrictions on sales, storage, etc., and for breweries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-02 - House - HB 291 PN 2326, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 154 N: 41 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-15 | First consideration | |
2010-06-15 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-09 | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE | |
2009-07-02 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-29 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |