PA HB250 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-07-23 - Referred to FINANCE
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for municipal volunteer fire company, volunteer ambulance service and volunteer rescue company service incentives.
Title
Providing for municipal volunteer fire company, volunteer ambulance service and volunteer rescue company service incentives.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-07-20 - House - HB 250 PN 2446, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - House - HB 250 PN 2385, 2009 A2526, HORNAMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-14 - House - HB 250 PN 2385, 2009 A2526, HORNAMAN (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-23 | Referred to FINANCE | |
2009-07-20 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-20 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-14 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-07-06 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-07-02 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-02 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-03 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-03 | First consideration | |
2009-06-03 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |