PA HB2488 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-22 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act providing for the annual designation and holiday observance June 19 as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.
Title
Providing for the annual designation and holiday observance June 19 as "Juneteenth National Freedom Day" in this Commonwealth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-22 - House - House Floor: HB 2488 PN 3709, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - House - House Urban Affairs: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-22 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2018-06-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-06-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2018-06-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-21 | House | Second consideration |
2018-06-21 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-19 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2018-06-19 | House | First consideration |
2018-06-19 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-06-18 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |