PA HB2487 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 39-7)
Status: Passed on October 16 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-16 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of September 30, 1983 (P.L.160, No.39), known as the Public Official Compensation Law, further providing for judicial salaries, for compensation of Governor and Lieutenant Governor, State Treasurer, Auditor General, Attorney General, Commissioners of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission and heads of departments and for members of the General Assembly; providing for cost-of-living adjustment hiatus; and making a repeal.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for judicial salaries, for compensation of Governor and Lieutenant Governor, State Treasurer, Auditor General, Attorney General, Commissioners of the Pennsylvania Public Utility Commission and heads of departments and for members of the General Assembly; providing for cost-of-living adjustment hiatus; and making a repeal.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2487 PN 3772, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-26 - House - House Floor: HB 2487 PN 3772, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-18 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05760 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-16SenateAct No. 79
2020-10-16SenateApproved by the Governor
2020-10-06SenatePresented to the Governor
2020-10-05SenateSigned in Senate
2020-09-23SenateSigned in House
2020-09-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2020-06-24SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-06-23SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-06-23SenateSecond consideration
2020-06-22SenateFirst consideration
2020-06-22SenateReported as committed
2020-06-04SenateReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT
2020-05-26SenateIn the Senate
2020-05-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2020-05-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-05-20HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-20HouseSecond consideration
2020-05-18HouseRemoved from table
2020-05-18HouseLaid on the table
2020-05-18HouseFirst consideration
2020-05-18HouseReported as amended
2020-05-05HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=2487
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2487&pn=3715
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=2487&pn=3772
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1961
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=05/18/2020&RollCallId=1962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1364
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/26/2020&RollCallId=2152
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=41&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=980
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/24/2020&RollCallId=1021
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=633

Bill Comments

feedback