PA HB245 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Act No. 16 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Passed on April 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-19 - Act No. 16 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for license without restriction, for institutional license and for temporary license.
Title
Further providing for license without restriction, for institutional license and for temporary license.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Kaufer [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] |
Rep. Mark Longietti [D] | Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-12 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 2929, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 2929, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 2141, 2021 A3774, WARD, K. Amendment No. A-3774 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: AMENDMENT A02237 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 213, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-12 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 2929, CONCUR (Y: 198 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 2929, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 245 PN 2141, 2021 A3774, WARD, K. Amendment No. A-3774 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: AMENDMENT A02237 (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-21 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Floor: HB 245 PN 213, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-19 | House | Act No. 16 of 2022 |
2022-04-19 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-04-13 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-04-12 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-04-12 | House | Signed in House |
2022-04-12 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (198-1) |
2022-04-12 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-04-11 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-04-05 | House | In the House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Amended on third consideration (49-0) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-09-21 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2021-03-23 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-03-23 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-0) |
2021-03-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2021-03-17 | House | Removed from table |
2021-03-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-03-15 | House | First consideration |
2021-03-15 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-01-25 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |