PA HB2415 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 41-27)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-07-03 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating a portion of PA Route 191 in Washington Township, Northampton County, as the "World War II Homefront Heroes Highway."
Title
Designating a portion of PA Route 191 in Washington Township, Northampton County, as the "World War II Homefront Heroes Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-02 - House - HB 2415 PN 4051, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-03 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2010-07-02 | In the Senate | |
2010-07-02 | Final passage | |
2010-07-02 | Third consideration, with amendments | |
2010-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2010-07-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-06-30 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4051 | |
2010-05-03 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-03 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-28 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-28 | First consideration | |
2010-04-28 | Reported as committed | |
2010-04-14 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |