PA HB240 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 31-9)
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-11 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 6 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-11 - Referred to EDUCATION
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act providing for sexual violence awareness education programs for new students matriculating to institutions of higher education or private licensed schools that receive public funding and for duties of the Department of Education.
Title
Providing for sexual violence awareness education programs for new students matriculating to institutions of higher education or private licensed schools that receive public funding and for duties of the Department of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-06 - House - HB 240 PN 250, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2009-05-06 | In the Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-05 | Second consideration | |
2009-05-05 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-03-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-03-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-11 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-11 | First consideration | |
2009-03-11 | Reported as committed | |
2009-02-04 | Referred to EDUCATION |