PA HB2364 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 8 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-09 - Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Stewart Township and Fayette County, separately, certain lands situate in Stewart Township, Fayette County, in exchange for Stewart Township and Fayette County, separately, granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park.
Title
Authorizing the Department of Conservation and Natural Resources, with the approval of the Governor, to grant and convey to Stewart Township and Fayette County, separately, certain lands situate in Stewart Township, Fayette County, in exchange for Stewart Township and Fayette County, separately, granting and conveying certain lands to the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to be added to those existing lands at Ohiopyle State Park.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-08 - House - HB 2364 PN 3426, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT | |
2010-06-08 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-07 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-25 | First consideration | |
2010-05-25 | Reported as committed | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |