PA HB224 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 26-2)
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on September 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-09-29 - Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for the posting of annual financial information for public school entities; in pupils and attendance, further providing for education and training of exceptional children; in charter schools, further providing for definitions and for school staff; in vocational education, further providing for vocational education equipment grants; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and payment reimbursement; in disruptive student programs, further providing for applications; in private alternative education institutions for disruptive students, further providing for contracts with private alternative education institutions; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2015-2016; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, providing for student-weighted basic education funding; further providing for payments to intermediate units, for special education payments to school districts, for extraordinary special education program expenses, for special education funding for eligible students with disabilities in Cost Category 3, and for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; and providing for ready-to-learn block grants.
Title
Providing for the posting of annual financial information for public school entities; in pupils and attendance, further providing for education and training of exceptional children; in charter schools, further providing for definitions and for school staff; in vocational education, further providing for vocational education equipment grants; in community colleges, further providing for financial program and payment reimbursement; in disruptive student programs, further providing for applications; in private alternative education institutions for disruptive students, further providing for contracts with private alternative education institutions; in funding for public libraries, providing for State aid for fiscal year 2015-2016; and, in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, providing for student-weighted basic education funding; further providing for payments to intermediate units, for special education payments to school districts, for extraordinary special education program expenses, for special education funding for eligible students with disabilities in Cost Category 3, and for assistance to school districts declared to be in financial recovery status or identified for financial watch status; and providing for ready-to-learn block grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-09-24 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 2180, CONCUR (Y: 112 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 224 PN 2180, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 214, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-24 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 2180, CONCUR (Y: 112 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-09-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 224 PN 2180, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-09-16 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 13 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Senate Education: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House Floor: HB 224 PN 214, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-03 - House - House Education: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-29 | Senate | Bill, together with Governor's Veto Message, laid on the table |
2015-09-29 | Senate | In the House |
2015-09-29 | House | Veto No. 6 |
2015-09-29 | House | Vetoed by the Governor |
2015-09-29 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2015-09-28 | House | Signed in Senate |
2015-09-24 | House | Signed in House |
2015-09-24 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (112-87) |
2015-09-24 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2015-09-21 | House | Referred to RULES |
2015-09-18 | House | In the House |
2015-09-18 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-19) |
2015-09-16 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-28 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2015-02-11 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-02-11 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2015-02-11 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-02-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-02-10 | House | Second consideration |
2015-02-09 | House | Removed from table |
2015-02-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-02-03 | House | First consideration |
2015-02-03 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-01-26 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |