PA HB2234 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-28 - Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING
Pending: Senate Urban Affairs & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 68 (Real and Personal Property) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, prohibiting deed restrictions pertaining to solar energy systems.
Title
Prohibiting deed restrictions pertaining to solar energy systems.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-23 - House - HB 2234 PN 3962, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 188 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-22 - House - HB 2234 PN 3795, 2009 A7236, CUTLER (Y: 90 N: 109 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-22 - House - HB 2234 PN 3795, 2009 A7236, CUTLER (Y: 90 N: 109 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-28 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING | |
2010-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-22 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-25 | First consideration | |
2010-05-25 | Reported as amended | |
2010-01-29 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |