PA HB2212 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-6)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 80
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1976 (P.L.1176, No.261), known as the Mobile Home Park Rights Act, further providing for short title and for definitions; providing for written leases; further providing for disclosure of fees; and making editorial changes.
Title
Further providing for short title and for definitions; providing for written leases; further providing for disclosure of fees; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-04 - House - HB 2212 PN 4391, CONCUR (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 2212 PN 4391, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - House - HB 2212 PN 3798, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - HB 2212 PN 3691, 2009 A7037, HARPER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 2212 PN 4391, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-26 - House - HB 2212 PN 3798, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - HB 2212 PN 3691, 2009 A7037, HARPER (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-19 | Act No. 80 | |
2010-10-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-04 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-04 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as amended | |
2010-06-08 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2010-05-26 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-26 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-25 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-04 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-03 | First consideration | |
2010-05-03 | Reported as amended | |
2010-01-20 | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |