PA HB2138 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 27-0)
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Veto No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on October 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-19 - Veto No. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 13, 1967 (P.L.31, No.21), known as the Human Services Code, in public assistance, providing for work requirements.
Title
In public assistance, providing for work requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 2138 PN 3328, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 30 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3328, FP (Y: 115 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3158, 2017 A6325, DOWLING (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-15 - Senate - Senate Rules And Executive Nominations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Committed (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-17 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3328, FP (Y: 115 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-04-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-11 - House - House Floor: HB 2138 PN 3158, 2017 A6325, DOWLING (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-04-10 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-19 | Senate | Veto No. 2 |
2018-10-19 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor |
2018-10-18 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Signed in House |
2018-10-17 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (30-19) |
2018-10-15 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | First consideration |
2018-06-12 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2018-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-04-17 | House | Final passage (115-80) |
2018-04-16 | House | Third consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-11 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2018-04-10 | House | Removed from table |
2018-04-10 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-04-10 | House | First consideration |
2018-04-10 | House | Reported as committed |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HEALTH |