PA HB209 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 24-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), entitled "An act providing for independent oversight and review of regulations, creating an Independent Regulatory Review Commission, providing for its powers and duties and making repeals," further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.
Title
Amending the act of June 25, 1982 (P.L.633, No.181), entitled "An act providing for independent oversight and review of regulations, creating an Independent Regulatory Review Commission, providing for its powers and duties and making repeals," further providing for definitions and for existing regulations; and establishing the Independent Office of the Repealer and providing for its power and duties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 209 PN 3162, FP (Y: 108 N: 83 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 209 PN 3162, 2017 A6750, COMITTA (Y: 74 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 209 PN 3162, 2017 A6746, COMITTA (Y: 65 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A05713 (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05713 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 209 PN 3162, 2017 A6750, COMITTA (Y: 74 N: 99 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 209 PN 3162, 2017 A6746, COMITTA (Y: 65 N: 107 NV: 0 Abs: 28) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended A05713 (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05713 (Y: 17 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-18 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2018-05-01 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-05-01 | House | Third consideration and final passage (108-83) |
2018-05-01 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-04-30 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-04-30 | House | Second consideration |
2018-04-16 | House | Removed from table |
2018-03-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-03-13 | House | First consideration |
2018-03-13 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-01-25 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |