PA HB1990 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 78-31)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-29 - Referred to RULES
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of August 9, 1955 (P.L.323, No.130), known as The County Code, further providing for other meeting expenses paid by counties and for the office of district attorney in certain counties.
Title
Further providing for other meeting expenses paid by counties and for the office of district attorney in certain counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1990 PN 4387, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - House - HB 1990 PN 2692, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-27 - House - HB 1990 PN 2692, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-09-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-15 | First consideration | |
2010-06-15 | Reported as committed | |
2010-04-29 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2010-04-27 | In the Senate | |
2010-04-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-04-26 | Second consideration | |
2010-04-26 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-01-27 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-27 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-26 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as committed | |
2009-09-22 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |