PA HB1874 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-22 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-10-22 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for confidentiality issues in the areas of attorney-client privilege and for counseling of sexually violent predators.
Title
Further providing for confidentiality issues in the areas of attorney-client privilege and for counseling of sexually violent predators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-23 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | Senate | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS |
2014-10-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-10-20 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (196-0) |
2014-10-20 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as amended with Prior Printer's No. 2935 |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-15 | House | In the House |
2014-10-15 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Amended on third consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2014-02-05 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-02-05 | House | Third consideration and final passage (179-0) |
2014-02-05 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-02-04 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-02-04 | House | Second consideration |
2014-02-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-28 | House | First consideration |
2014-01-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |