PA HB1862 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-11-18 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1985 (P.L.457, No.112), known as the Medical Practice Act of 1985, further providing for institutional license; and abrogating a related regulation.
Title
Further providing for institutional license; and abrogating a related regulation.
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Gillespie [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Carol Hill-Evans [D] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] |
Rep. Tina Pickett [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-18 | House | Removed from table |
2022-11-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-07-06 | House | Removed from table |
2022-07-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-14 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |