PA HB1842 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Passed on November 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-02 - Act No. 120
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of October 5, 1978 (P.L.1109, No.261), known as the Osteopathic Medical Practice Act, further providing for perfusionist.
Title
Further providing for perfusionist.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1842 PN 2878, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1842 PN 2878, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-23 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1842 PN 2878, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-02 | Senate | Act No. 120 |
2016-11-02 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Signed in House |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-06-23 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-06-23 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |