PA HB1837 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-7)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-16 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 11, 1996 (2nd Sp.Sess., P.L.1879, No.10), known as the Flood Insurance Education and Information Act, further providing for flood insurance education and information.
Title
Further providing for flood insurance education and information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-09-24 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1837 PN 2764, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1837 PN 2764, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-16 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2014-09-24 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-09-24 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2013-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-12-09 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-11-18 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |