PA HB1836 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 21-8)
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.
Title
Authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Physical Therapy Licensure Compact; and providing for the form of the compact.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-10-17 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | House | Removed from table |
2018-06-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-05-02 | House | Removed from table |
2018-05-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2018-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2018-01-23 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-24 | House | Removed from table |
2017-10-17 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-10-17 | House | First consideration |
2017-10-17 | House | Reported as committed |
2017-10-10 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |