PA HB1799 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemptions for improvements and redevelopment of shopping malls; establishing the Economic Development and Mixed-Use Redevelopment Advisory Committee within the State Planning Board; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Title
Authorizing local taxing authorities to provide for tax exemptions for improvements and redevelopment of shopping malls; establishing the Economic Development and Mixed-Use Redevelopment Advisory Committee within the State Planning Board; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Department of Community and Economic Development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-15 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2943, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2920, 2023 A3996 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3940 (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3739 (Y: 98 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3925, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03233 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03579 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2943, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 106 N: 95 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2920, 2023 A3996 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3940 (Y: 198 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3739 (Y: 98 N: 102 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1799 PN 2754, 2023 A3925, MOTION TO APPEAL RULING OF THE CHAIR (Y: 102 N: 98 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03233 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Adopt Amendment A03579 (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-20 - House - House Local Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT |
2024-04-15 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-15 | House | Final passage (106-95) |
2024-04-15 | House | Third consideration, with amendments (201-0) |
2024-04-15 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-10 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-10 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-04-09 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-20 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-10-27 | House | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |