PA HB1774 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 68
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, further providing for marketing and administration of service contracts being distinct from the business of insurance.
Title
Further providing for marketing and administration of service contracts being distinct from the business of insurance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-28 - Senate - HB 1774 PN 4065, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - House - HB 1774 PN 4065, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - House - HB 1774 PN 2286, 2010 A8312, BOYD (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-01 - House - HB 1774 PN 4065, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-30 - House - HB 1774 PN 2286, 2010 A8312, BOYD (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Act No. 68 | |
2010-10-07 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in House | |
2010-09-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as committed | |
2010-07-01 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2010-07-01 | In the Senate | |
2010-07-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-30 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-06-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-09-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-09-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-09-10 | Laid on the table | |
2009-09-10 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-30 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-30 | First consideration | |
2009-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-24 | Referred to INSURANCE |