PA HB1773 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act repealing in part the act of June 13, 1836 (P.L.551, No.169), entitled "An act relating to roads, highways and bridges."
Title
Repealing in part the act of June 13, 1836 (P.L.551, No.169), entitled "An act relating to roads, highways and bridges."
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Gabler [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Ed Neilson [D] | Sen. Judith Ward [R] |
Rep. Jeff Wheeland [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Thomas Sankey [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-24 - House - House Floor: HB 1773 PN 2816, FP (Y: 156 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05201 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04785 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05201 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House State Government: To Table (Y: 9 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-12-05 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A04785 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2018-01-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2018-01-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (156-31) |
2018-01-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2018-01-23 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2018-01-23 | House | Second consideration |
2018-01-22 | House | Removed from table |
2017-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2017-12-12 | House | First consideration |
2017-12-12 | House | Reported as amended |
2017-09-12 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |