PA HB174 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-4)
Status: Passed on November 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-23 - Act No. 106
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

An Act amending Title 3 (Agriculture) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, codifying the Public Eating and Drinking Place Law and the Food Act; providing for the protection of public health and for regulations; requiring licensing; further providing for organic foods, for maple products, for food employee certification and for farmers' market; providing for penalties; and making related repeals.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Codifying the Public Eating and Drinking Place Law and the Food Act; providing for the protection of public health and for regulations; requiring licensing; further providing for organic foods, for maple products, for food employee certification and for farmers' market; providing for penalties; and making related repeals.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2010-11-15 - House - HB 174 PN 4473, CONCUR (Y: 103 N: 93 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-14 - Senate - HB 174 PN 4473, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-10 - House - HB 174 PN 2067, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 102 N: 92 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-09 - House - HB 174 PN 901, 2009 A1688, SUSP RULES, SCAVELLO (Y: 95 N: 98 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2010-11-23 Act No. 106
2010-11-23 Approved by the Governor
2010-11-17 Presented to the Governor
2010-11-17 Signed in Senate
2010-11-15 Signed in House
2010-11-15 House concurred in Senate amendments
2010-11-15 Reported as committed
2010-10-18 Referred to RULES
2010-10-14 In the House
2010-10-14 Third consideration and final passage
2010-10-13 Amended on third consideration
2010-10-12 Second consideration
2010-09-27 Re-reported as amended
2010-09-21 Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2010-09-20 First consideration
2010-09-20 Reported as amended
2009-06-11 Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2009-06-10 In the Senate
2009-06-10 Third consideration and final passage
2009-06-09 Second consideration, with amendments
2009-06-09 Re-reported as committed
2009-03-10 Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2009-03-10 Removed from table
2009-03-09 Laid on the table
2009-03-09 First consideration
2009-03-09 Reported as amended
2009-02-02 Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2009&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=174
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=0174
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=0901
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=2067
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=4266
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=4327
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=HTM&sessYr=2009&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0174&pn=4473
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2009&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=424
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2009&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=434
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2009&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=661
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2009&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=2017

Bill Comments 750

feedback