PA HB1736 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-30 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 1983 (P.L.260, No.72), referred to as the Public Adjuster Licensing Law, further providing for violations; and providing for civil remedy.
Title
Further providing for violations; and providing for civil remedy.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-30 - House - HB 1736 PN 3440, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-30 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2010-06-30 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-29 | Second consideration | |
2010-06-29 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-24 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-03-24 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-23 | Laid on the table | |
2010-03-23 | First consideration | |
2010-03-23 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-17 | Referred to INSURANCE |