PA HB1689 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-15 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-15 - Referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act making an appropriation to the Franklin Institute Science Museum for maintenance expenses.
Title
Making an appropriation to the Franklin Institute Science Museum for maintenance expenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-12-14 - House - HB 1689 PN 2777, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 144 N: 46 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-15 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-12-14 | In the Senate | |
2009-12-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-10-07 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-08-04 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-08-04 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-30 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-17 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-17 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-16 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-12 | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |