PA HB1623 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 12-1)
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-07 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-10-07 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, further providing for evaluation of applications for certification.
Title
Further providing for evaluation of applications for certification.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-07 | House | Removed from table |
2014-10-07 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-29 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-06-03 | House | Removed from table |
2014-06-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-03-19 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-12 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-12 | House | Removed from table |
2013-10-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-10-16 | House | First consideration |
2013-10-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-07-24 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |