PA HB1597 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 64 (Public Authorities and Quasi-Public Corporations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for indebtedness and for the Second Stage Loan Program.
Title
Further providing for indebtedness and for the Second Stage Loan Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1597 PN 1989, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-22 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-22 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-22 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-16 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-16 | First consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-03 | Referred to COMMERCE |