PA HB1570 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 22-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-09-24 - Laid on the table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 19, 1979 (P.L.130, No.48), known as the Health Care Facilities Act, in licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions and for licensure, providing for medical staff requirements for hospital licensure, further providing for term and content of license and for reliance on accrediting agencies and Federal Government; and providing for reliance on national accreditation organizations for hospitals.
Title
In licensing of health care facilities, further providing for definitions and for licensure, providing for medical staff requirements for hospital licensure, further providing for term and content of license and for reliance on accrediting agencies and Federal Government; and providing for reliance on national accreditation organizations for hospitals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-09-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2012-09-24 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2012-06-06 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2012-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2012-06-06 | House | Reported as amended |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to HEALTH |