PA HB1437 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Passed on November 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-03 - Act No. 133
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 20, 2000 (P.L.724, No.99), known as the Municipal Code and Ordinance Compliance Act, further providing for definitions; providing for issuance of use and occupancy certificate and for applicability; and further providing for compliance requirement.
Title
Further providing for definitions; providing for issuance of use and occupancy certificate and for applicability; and further providing for compliance requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1437 PN 3952, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 3952, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 3196, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 2460, 2015 A6773, SANTORA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03744 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03744 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1437 PN 3952, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 3952, CONCUR (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-10-24 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-27 - Senate - Senate Urban Affairs And Housing: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 3196, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1437 PN 2460, 2015 A6773, SANTORA (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03744 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03744 (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Urban Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-03 | House | Act No. 133 |
2016-11-03 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2016-10-27 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in Senate |
2016-10-26 | House | Signed in House |
2016-10-26 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (192-0) |
2016-10-26 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2016-10-26 | House | Referred to RULES |
2016-10-26 | House | In the House |
2016-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (47-0) |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-27 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS AND HOUSING |
2016-05-02 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-02 | House | Third consideration and final passage (199-0) |
2016-05-02 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-04-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-04-13 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2015-12-02 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-12-02 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-28 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-28 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-28 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-07-06 | House | Referred to URBAN AFFAIRS |