PA HB1431 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 36-13)
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 23 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-06-26 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts or practices and exclusions and for civil penalties; and adding provisions relating to unsafe children's products.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for unlawful acts or practices and exclusions and for civil penalties; and adding provisions relating to unsafe children's products.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-23 - House - HB 1431 PN 2183, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-26 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2009-06-23 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-23 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-22 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-16 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-03 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-02 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-02 | First consideration | |
2009-06-02 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-05 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |