PA HB1283 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-06-30 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Title
In rules of the road in general, further providing for additional parking regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - House - House Floor: HB 1283 PN 1399, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 198 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2023-06-20 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-06-20 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-5) |
2023-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-06-13 | House | Second consideration |
2023-06-12 | House | Removed from table |
2023-06-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-06-05 | House | First consideration |
2023-06-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2023-05-31 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |