PA HB121 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 17-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 27 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-28 - Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE
Pending: Senate Law & Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 12, 1951 (P.L.90, No.21), known as the Liquor Code, further providing for definitions, for general powers of the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores, for shipment of wine into Commonwealth and for limited wineries.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for general powers of the Pennsylvania Liquor Control Board, for sales by Pennsylvania liquor stores, for shipment of wine into Commonwealth and for limited wineries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-27 - House - HB 121 PN 577, FP (Y: 200 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-28 | Senate | Referred to LAW AND JUSTICE |
2013-06-27 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-06-27 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-1) |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-02-06 | House | Removed from table |
2013-02-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-02-05 | House | First consideration |
2013-02-05 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-01-16 | House | Referred to LIQUOR CONTROL |