PA HB1186 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-09 - Act No. 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 9, 1929 (P.L.177, No.175), known as The Administrative Code of 1929, establishing the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs; providing for governing body of the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; making a related repeal; repealing related provisions of the Pennsylvania Drug and Alcohol Abuse and Control Act; and making editorial changes.
Title
Establishing the Department of Drug and Alcohol Programs; providing for governing body of the Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency; making a related repeal; repealing related provisions of the Pennsylvania Drug and Alcohol Abuse and Control Act; and making editorial changes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-07-03 - Senate - HB 1186 PN 4094, CONCUR IN HOUSE AMENDMENTS TO SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 40 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-02 - Senate - HB 1186 PN 4077, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - HB 1186 PN 3130, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-07-02 - Senate - HB 1186 PN 4077, FINAL PASSAGE-RECONSIDERED (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-05-25 - House - HB 1186 PN 3130, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-09 | Act No. 50 | |
2010-07-09 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-07-03 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-07-03 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-07-03 | Signed in House | |
2010-07-03 | Senate concurred in House amendments to Senate amendments | |
2010-07-03 | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed | |
2010-07-03 | Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS | |
2010-07-03 | In the Senate | |
2010-07-03 | House concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House | |
2010-07-03 | Reported as amended | |
2010-07-02 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-07-02 | In the House | |
2010-07-02 | Final passage | |
2010-07-02 | Vote on final passage reconsidered | |
2010-07-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-07-01 | Second consideration | |
2010-07-01 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-06-30 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-06-30 | First consideration | |
2010-06-30 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-08 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2010-05-25 | In the Senate | |
2010-05-25 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-05-24 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-02-08 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-02-08 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-01-25 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-25 | Removed from table | |
2010-01-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-25 | First consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Reported as committed | |
2009-04-03 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |