PA HB1161 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 33-21)
Status: Passed on December 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-12-17 - Act No. 78
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 22, 1983 (P.L.306, No.84), known as the Board of Vehicles Act, further providing for definitions and for license to engage in business.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for license to engage in business.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1161 PN 1512, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1161 PN 1512, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-27 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1161 PN 1512, FP (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-28 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-24 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Act No. 78 |
2015-12-17 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2015-12-08 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Signed in House |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2015-11-24 | Senate | Second consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | First consideration |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2015-06-29 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-06-29 | House | Third consideration and final passage (193-0) |
2015-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-06-28 | House | Second consideration |
2015-06-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-06-24 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2015-06-24 | House | First consideration |
2015-06-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-05-11 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |