PA HB1128 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-27 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, providing for alternative energy portfolio standards and for alternative compliance payments; and further providing civil penalties for gas pipeline safety violations.
Title
Providing for alternative energy portfolio standards and for alternative compliance payments; and further providing civil penalties for gas pipeline safety violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-06-02 - House - HB 1128 PN 1331, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-22 | First consideration | |
2010-09-22 | Reported as amended | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE | |
2009-06-02 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-02 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-06-01 | Second consideration | |
2009-06-01 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-05-11 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-05-11 | Removed from table | |
2009-05-07 | Laid on the table | |
2009-05-07 | First consideration | |
2009-05-07 | Reported as committed | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |