PA HB1056 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 12-7)
Status: Passed on February 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-04 - Act No. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 1, 1933 (P.L.216, No.76), known as The Dental Law, providing for temporary volunteer dental licenses.
Title
Providing for temporary volunteer dental licenses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - HB 1056 PN 1284, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-11-19 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - HB 1056 PN 1284, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | Act No. 7 |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-01-28 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-11 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-11-19 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-11-19 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2013-04-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (191-0) |
2013-04-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-04-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | House | Second consideration |
2013-04-15 | House | Removed from table |
2013-04-09 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-04-09 | House | First consideration |
2013-04-09 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |