PA HB101 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-17 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-11-17 - Act No. 104
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in school districts, further providing for reports to Department of Education and providing for value-added assessment system and for drop-out data collection; in intermediate units, further providing for financial reports; providing for payment of fees associated with certification by the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards; in certification of teachers, further providing for disqualifications relating to teacher's certificate; in pupils and attendance, further providing for residence and right to free school privileges and providing for emergency permits at approved private schools and chartered schools for the deaf and blind; in provisions relating to safe schools, further providing for definitions and for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for regulations; and further providing for reporting by school entities; in school health services, further providing for possession and use of asthma inhalers and epinephrine auto-injectors, for medical examinations of teachers and other persons and for duties of Department of Education; in terms and courses of study, providing for economic education and personal financial literacy programs, for State standards for business, computer and information technology courses and for dating violence education; establishing the Science Technology Partnership Program; in high schools, further providing for academic degrees; in charter schools, further providing for facilities; providing for the Older Pennsylvanian Higher Education Program, for course materials at institutions of higher education and for sexual violence education at institutions of higher education; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for effect of failure to file reports; and making editorial changes and related repeals.
Title
In school districts, further providing for reports to Department of Education and providing for value-added assessment system and for drop-out data collection; in intermediate units, further providing for financial reports; providing for payment of fees associated with certification by the National Board for Professional Teaching Standards; in certification of teachers, further providing for disqualifications relating to teacher's certificate; in pupils and attendance, further providing for residence and right to free school privileges and providing for emergency permits at approved private schools and chartered schools for the deaf and blind; in provisions relating to safe schools, further providing for definitions and for the Office for Safe Schools; providing for regulations; and further providing for reporting by school entities; in school health services, further providing for possession and use of asthma inhalers and epinephrine auto-injectors, for medical examinations of teachers and other persons and for duties of Department of Education; in terms and courses of study, providing for economic education and personal financial literacy programs, for State standards for business, computer and information technology courses and for dating violence education; establishing the Science Technology Partnership Program; in high schools, further providing for academic degrees; in charter schools, further providing for facilities; providing for the Older Pennsylvanian Higher Education Program, for course materials at institutions of higher education and for sexual violence education at institutions of higher education; in reimbursements by Commonwealth and between school districts, further providing for effect of failure to file reports; and making editorial changes and related repeals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - HB 101 PN 4389, MOT OVERRIDE (Y: 171 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-05 - House - HB 101 PN 4389, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 101 PN 4389, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - HB 101 PN 3129, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-05 - House - HB 101 PN 4389, CONCUR (Y: 180 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 101 PN 4389, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-08 - House - HB 101 PN 3129, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-17 | Act No. 104 | |
2010-11-22 | Act No. 104 | |
2010-11-22 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-12-25 | Motion to override Governor's Veto, adopted, the objections of the Governor to the contrary notwithstanding, Nov. 17, 2010 | |
2010-12-25 | In the Senate | |
2010-12-25 | Motion to override Governor's Veto, adopted, the objections of the Governor to the contrary notwithstanding, Nov. 15, 2010 | |
2010-10-22 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-05 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-05 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-10-05 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-22 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | First consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Reported as amended | |
2010-03-09 | Referred to EDUCATION | |
2010-03-08 | In the Senate | |
2010-03-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-02-08 | Second consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Re-reported as amended | |
2009-02-05 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-02-05 | Removed from table | |
2009-02-04 | Laid on the table | |
2009-02-04 | First consideration | |
2009-02-04 | Reported as amended | |
2009-01-28 | Referred to EDUCATION |