OR SCR7 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In memoriam: Secretary of State and former state Representative Dennis Michael Richardson, 1949-2019. In memoriam: Secretary of State and former state Representative Dennis Michael Richardson, 1949-2019.
Title
In memoriam: Secretary of State and former state Representative Dennis Michael Richardson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-17 - Senate - Senate Final Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - Senate - Senate Committee Do adopt (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Final reading. Carried by Thatcher. Adopted. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Heard, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do adopt. |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |