OR SB954 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Effective date, June 12, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-15 - Effective date, June 12, 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Allows circuit court judge to authorize execution of search warrant outside judicial district for interrelated conduct carried on in more than one county. Allows circuit court judge to authorize execution of search warrant outside judicial district for interrelated conduct carried on in more than one county. Defines "interrelated conduct." Allows judge assigned to judicial district to authorize execution of search warrant in that judicial district regardless of whether regularly elected or appointed judge for that judicial district is available. Prohibits presenting application for search warrant that is denied in one judicial district to judge in another judicial district. Creates exceptions. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to crime; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-31 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-15 | Senate | Effective date, June 12, 2023. |
2023-06-15 | Senate | Chapter 216, 2023 Laws. |
2023-06-12 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2023-06-07 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-05-31 | House | Vote explanation(s) filed by Bynum. |
2023-05-31 | House | Third reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 51; Nays, 5--Bynum, Chaichi, Dexter, Gamba, Walters; Excused, 4--Boshart Davis, Hieb, Osborne, Wallan. |
2023-05-30 | House | Carried over to May 31, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-26 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2023 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2023-05-25 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-24 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2023 Calendar. |
2023-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2023-05-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2023-05-16 | House | Work Session held. |
2023-05-04 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-04-11 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 4--Bonham, Boquist, Linthicum, Robinson; Excused, 2--Gorsek, Thatcher. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Carried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Carried over to 04-05 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |