OR SB696 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases amount of insurance policy that may be required by county governing body to approve permit for outdoor mass gathering. Allows county governing body to require organizer of mass gathering to obtain insurance policy in amount commensurate with risk, but not exceeding limitation for liability of local public body under Oregon Tort Claims Act.
Title
Relating to mass gatherings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - House Committee Do pass and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 340, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-04 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Gorsek. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Barreto, Boshart Davis, McKeown. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-22 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-05-06 | House | Recommendation: Do pass and be referred to Judiciary by prior reference. |
2019-05-02 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-16 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-11 | House | Referred to Agriculture and Land Use with subsequent referral to Judiciary. |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |