OR SB681 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Permits person to enter into oral or written supported decision-making agreement and provides scope of valid agreement. Prescribes optional form for] of written supported decision-making agreement. Limits liability of supporter acting under authority granted in statutory form for] written supported decision-making agreement and]. Limits liability of individuals relying on supporter's authority under statutory form] written supported decision-making agreement utilizing optional form of agreement. Requires court to consider supported decision-making as less restrictive alternative to protective proceeding. Modifies notice requirements in protective proceedings to require that notice be provided to supporters under supported decision-making agreement. Requires certain disclosures before professional supporter may enter into supported decision-making agreement. Directs school district to provide child with disability and child's parents with information regarding supported decision-making.
Title
Relating to supported decision-making agreements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Human Services be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments, be printed A-Engrossed, subsequent referral to Human Services be rescinded by order of the President and be referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary, then Human Services. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |